Global Patent Index - EP 1482795 A1

EP 1482795 A1 2004-12-08 - NEW IMMUNOEFFECTOR COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

NEW IMMUNOEFFECTOR COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

NEUE IMMUNEFFEKTOR-VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX COMPOSES IMMUNO-EFFECTEURS

Publication

EP 1482795 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02723106 A

Priority

US 0203580 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03065806A1] This invention provides compounds containing a 2-deoxy-2-amino- beta -D-glucopyranose (glucosamine) glycosidically linked to an cyclic aminoalkyl (aglycon) group. The invention further provides methods for inducing an immune response using the compounds of the present invention in the presence or absence of an antigen. In addition, methods for treating disease with the compounds of the present invention with or without an antigen are also provided in this invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/04; C07G 11/00; C07H 15/00; A61K 51/00; A61K 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 31/7056 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/005 (2006.01); A61K 39/008 (2006.01); A61K 39/095 (2006.01); A61K 39/112 (2006.01); A61K 39/118 (2006.01); A61K 39/145 (2006.01); A61K 39/21 (2006.01); A61K 39/23 (2006.01); A61K 39/245 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 49/04 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07G 11/00 (2006.01); C07H 15/00 (2006.01); C07H 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 15/26 (2013.01); A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 47/543 (2017.08); A61K 47/549 (2017.08); A61K 2039/55511 (2013.01); Y02A 50/403 (2018.01); Y02A 50/41 (2018.01); Y02A 50/412 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03065806 A1 20030814; AT 447844 T 20091115; AU 2002253909 A1 20030902; AU 2002253909 B2 20080605; BR 0215588 A 20050322; CA 2474398 A1 20030814; CN 1301134 C 20070221; CN 1622754 A 20050601; CY 1109692 T1 20140813; CZ 20040862 A3 20050112; DE 60234386 D1 20091224; DK 1482795 T3 20100201; EP 1482795 A1 20041208; EP 1482795 A4 20060809; EP 1482795 B1 20091111; ES 2336080 T3 20100408; HU 0500539 A2 20060928; IL 163304 A 20101130; JP 2005516980 A 20050609; KR 100885008 B1 20090220; KR 20040083433 A 20041001; MX PA04008559 A 20041206; NO 20043707 A 20040903; PT 1482795 E 20100209

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20180205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLEESTRASSE 87, 4054 BASEL (CH)

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180302

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CORIXA CORP., WILMINGTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CORIXA CORP., SEATTLE, WASH., US

- Document: DE 60234386

2017-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60234386

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2017-05-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60234386

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100812

2010-04-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2336080 T3

2010-02-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-02-09 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-02-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-01-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2010-01-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090403235

2009-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60234386 P 20091224

2009-12-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-11-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-11-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 43/04 20060101AFI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07G 11/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 15/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 51/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 49/04 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 37/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 37/04 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 31/00 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 9/10 20060101ALI20090423BHEP

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061205

2006-08-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060710

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI