Global Patent Index - EP 1483065 A1

EP 1483065 A1 2004-12-08 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING HYDROCARBONS SPILLS FROM UNDERGROUND AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR RECOVERING HYDROCARBONS SPILLS FROM UNDERGROUND AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFVERUNREINIGUNGEN VON UNTER DER ERDE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DES FUITES D'HYDROCARBURES DANS LA TERRE ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN APPLICATION DU PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1483065 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03743905 A

Priority

  • FI 0300189 W
  • FI 20020457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076093A1] The present invention relates to a method for recovering of hydrocarbons spilt into the soil, in which method hydrocarbons spilt into the soil are removed with a vac­uum pump (6) to a reservoir (4), recovered and at least a part of hydrocarbons is disposed. In the method in accordance with the invention hydrocarbons are con­ducted quickly after a leakage to a reservoir (4) from the ground and/or soil as liq­uid as well as vapor, and hydrocarbon vapors are separated (3) in the reservoir (4) during the process controlled and continuously from liquids, conducted to a separate burning device (7) and disposed controlled. The device in accordance with the in­vention includes a reservoir (4), a vacuum pump (6) for creating vacuum, one or several hoses 2 or corresponding for extracting hydrocarbon from the ground and/or soil by means of vacuum and a burning device (7) for disposing at least a part of hydrocarbons. Furthermore, the device includes a separating device (3) placed in the vacuum reservoir for separating hydrocarbons from liquids controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B09C 1/00; B08B 9/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01); B09C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/027 (2013.01); B08B 9/035 (2013.01); B09C 1/00 (2013.01); B09C 1/005 (2013.01); B09C 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03076093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076093 A1 20030918; AU 2003209802 A1 20030922; EP 1483065 A1 20041208; FI 116614 B 20060113; FI 20020457 A0 20020312; FI 20020457 A 20030913

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20111119

2011-11-19 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALMEMIES, SAKARI

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARFFMAN, MIKA

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOETTOENEN, YRJOE

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUOMI, PEKKA T.

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALMEMIES, SAKARI

2008-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARFFMAN, MIKA

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071025

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK