Global Patent Index - EP 1483152 A1

EP 1483152 A1 2004-12-08 - DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PACKAGE BLANKS IN A CIGARETTE PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PACKAGE BLANKS IN A CIGARETTE PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERGABE VON PACKUNGSZUSCHNITTEN IN EINER ZIGARETTEN-PACKUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF CONCU POUR TRANSFERER DES DECOUPES DE PAQUET DANS UNE EMPAQUETEUSE DE CIGARETTES

Publication

EP 1483152 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03708196 A

Priority

  • DE 10210762 A
  • EP 0302390 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076269A1] During the continuous production of hinged-lid-type cigarette packs, blanks (10) are removed from a blank hopper (12) by a removing member, i.e. a transfer turret (13), such that an unprinted inner surface of the blanks (10) is radially facing outwards while the blanks are transported by the transfer turret (13). Glue is applied to the outward-facing inner surface by a gluing unit (22) while the blank (10) is transported by the transfer turret (13). Said gluing unit (22) is arranged above the transfer turret and applies glue to the blanks (10) in a downward direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B65B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 41/06 (2013.01); B65B 19/225 (2013.01); B65B 19/226 (2013.01); B65B 19/228 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076269 A1 20030918; AU 2003212317 A1 20030922; DE 10210762 A1 20031002; DE 50311607 D1 20090730; EP 1483152 A1 20041208; EP 1483152 B1 20090617

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170308

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50311607

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100318

2009-07-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311607 P 20090730

2009-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2009-06-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061204

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK