Global Patent Index - EP 1483260 A1

EP 1483260 A1 2004-12-08 - CDK INHIBITING 2-HETEROARYL PYRIMIDINE, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF AS A MEDICAMENT

Title (en)

CDK INHIBITING 2-HETEROARYL PYRIMIDINE, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF AS A MEDICAMENT

Title (de)

CDK INHIBITORISCHE 2-HETEROARYL-PYRIMIDINE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

2-HETEROARYLE-PYRIMIDINES INHIBITRICES DE LA KINASE DEPENDANTE DES CYCLINES, LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS

Publication

EP 1483260 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03708151 A

Priority

  • DE 10212100 A
  • DE 10255984 A
  • EP 0301995 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076437A1] The invention relates to 2-heteroaryl pyrimidine derivatives of general formula I or If as inhibitors of cyclin-dependent kinasis, the production thereof, and the use thereof as a medicament for treating various diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 403/12; A61K 31/506; A61P 35/02; C07D 409/14; C07D 417/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/14 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2013.01); C07D 233/56 (2013.01); C07D 249/08 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03076437A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076437 A1 20030918; AR 038922 A1 20050202; AU 2003212282 A1 20030922; EP 1483260 A1 20041208; JP 2005526765 A 20050908; PE 01562004 A1 20040607; TW 200406406 A 20040501; UY 27714 A1 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUECKING, ULRICH

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRUEGER, MARTIN

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JAUTELAT, ROLF

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRIEN, OLAF

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEMEISTER, GERD

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERNST, ALEXANDER

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUECKING, ULRICH

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRUEGER, MARTIN

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JAUTELAT, ROLF

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRIEN, OLAF

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEMEISTER, GERD

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERNST, ALEXANDER

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO