EP 1483431 A4 20060628 - MINIMISING CARBON TRANSFER IN AN ELECTROLYTIC CELL
Title (en)
MINIMISING CARBON TRANSFER IN AN ELECTROLYTIC CELL
Title (de)
MINIMIERUNG DES KOHLENSTOFFTRANSFERS IN EINER ELEKTROLYSEZELLE
Title (fr)
MINIMISATION DU TRANSFERT DE CARBONE DANS UNE CELLULE ELECTROLYTIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- AU 0300305 W 20030313
- AU PS117002 A 20020313
Abstract (en)
[origin: US2005092129A1] An electrolytic cell for reducing a metal oxide, such as titania, in a solid state is disclosed. The electrolytic cell includes an anode formed from carbon and a cathode formed at least in part from the metal oxide. The electrolytic cell also includes a membrane that is permeable to oxygen anions and is impermeable to carbon in ionic and non-ionic forms positioned between the cathode and the anode to thereby prevent migration of carbon to the cathode.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C25C 1/22 (2006.01); C22B 9/14 (2006.01); C22B 34/12 (2006.01); C25C 5/00 (2006.01); C25C 7/00 (2006.01); C25C 7/02 (2006.01); C25C 7/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C22B 34/129 (2013.01 - EP US); C25C 7/005 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 9964638 A1 19991216 - UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al
- [A] US 6017647 A 20000125 - WALLIN STEN A [US]
- [X] CHEN G Z ET AL: "Direct electrochemical reduction of titanium dioxide to titanium in molten calcium chloride", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, vol. 407, 21 September 2000 (2000-09-21), pages 361 - 364, XP002968414, ISSN: 0028-0836
- [X] SADOWAY D R ET AL: "Electrochemical deoxidation of yttrium-oxygen solid solutions", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 237, 15 April 1996 (1996-04-15), pages 150 - 154, XP004077077, ISSN: 0925-8388
- [X] OKABE T H ET AL: "ELECTROCHEMICAL DEOXIDATION OF TITANIUM", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS B. PROCESS METALLURGY, METALLURGICAL SOCIETY OF AIME. NEW YORK, US, vol. 24B, June 1993 (1993-06-01), pages 449 - 455, XP000381332
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 03076692 A1 20030918; AT E367461 T1 20070815; AU PS117002 A0 20020418; CA 2479050 A1 20030918; CN 1650052 A 20050803; DE 60314999 D1 20070830; EP 1483431 A1 20041208; EP 1483431 A4 20060628; EP 1483431 B1 20070718; JP 2005520046 A 20050707; MX PA04008886 A 20041126; RU 2004130453 A 20050610; RU 2302482 C2 20070710; US 2005092129 A1 20050505; ZA 200407433 B 20051010
DOCDB simple family (application)
AU 0300305 W 20030313; AT 03743766 T 20030313; AU PS117002 A 20020313; CA 2479050 A 20030313; CN 03809274 A 20030313; DE 60314999 T 20030313; EP 03743766 A 20030313; JP 2003574884 A 20030313; MX PA04008886 A 20030313; RU 2004130453 A 20030313; US 93900104 A 20040910; ZA 200407433 A 20040916