Global Patent Index - EP 1483599 A1

EP 1483599 A1 2004-12-08 - ULTRASONIC IMAGING SOFTWARE AND HARDWARE PACK

Title (en)

ULTRASONIC IMAGING SOFTWARE AND HARDWARE PACK

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLABBILDUNGSSOFTWARE UND HARDWARE-PACK

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE MATERIEL ET LOGICIEL D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE

Publication

EP 1483599 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 03743914 A

Priority

  • FR 0300742 W
  • FR 0203122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076965A1] An ultrasonic imaging pack (16) consisting of an ultrasonic imaging pre-processing hardware part and a software part which is installed on a microcomputer, the hardware part including at least one ultrasonic probe (17) which is connected (17A) to a module consisting of electronic circuits (18) of which at least one part can be configured, said module comprising analog FEC circuits (31), a set of analog/digital converters, a network of electronic gateways (33, 34) and a high-speed link (35) between the module and the microcomputer, the software part being stored on a removable medium (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 15/89

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/00 (2006.01); G01S 15/89 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/899 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03076965A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076965 A1 20030918; AU 2003232286 A1 20030922; EP 1483599 A1 20041208; FR 2837285 A1 20030919; FR 2837285 B1 20060721; JP 2005526551 A 20050908; KR 20040111391 A 20041231; US 2005119574 A1 20050602

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121206

2012-12-06 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES ULTRASONICS SAS

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061117

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES ULTRASONICS SAS

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE FRAGUIER, SIXTE,C/OTHALES IP

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SORENSEN, TORE,C/OTHALES IP

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAERFELD, CHARLESTHALES INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK