Global Patent Index - EP 1483682 A2

EP 1483682 A2 2004-12-08 - RECONFIGURABLE PROCESSOR

Title (en)

RECONFIGURABLE PROCESSOR

Title (de)

RECONFIGURIERBARER PROZESSOR

Title (fr)

PROCESSEUR RECONFIGURABLE

Publication

EP 1483682 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 03706240 A

Priority

  • DE 0300152 W
  • DE 10202044 A
  • DE 10202175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03060747A2] The invention relates to a processor with a reconfigurable field of data-processing cells and a register means. Said register means is provided with a data stream storage means designed to store a data stream or parts thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 15/78 (2006.01); G06F 15/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/7867 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03060747A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03060747 A2 20030724; WO 03060747 A3 20040304; AU 2003208266 A1 20030730; AU 2003208266 A8 20030730; DE 10392560 D2 20050512; EP 1483682 A2 20041208; US 2006090062 A1 20060427; US 8281108 B2 20121002

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160802

2014-12-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

- Name of requester: XILINX, INC., US

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PACT XPP TECHNOLOGIES AG

2010-02-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICHTER, THOMAS

2010-02-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRASS, MAREN

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO