Global Patent Index - EP 1483983 A1

EP 1483983 A1 2004-12-08 - Support apparatus

Title (en)

Support apparatus

Title (de)

Stützgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de support

Publication

EP 1483983 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04253326 A

Priority

GB 0313050 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus (10) for supporting objects on a shelf, comprising an elongate assembly (12) and at least one divider (14) releasably mounted thereon. The elongate assembly (12) comprises a first part (16), a second part (18) and a spring bias (20) disposed therebetween. The first and second parts (16),(18) are movable relative to each other, with compression of spring bias (20) providing a force urging apart the parts (16),(18) along the longitudinal axis AA. In this way, the assembly (12) may be braced between opposed side wall of a shelf in a book case or the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/58; A47B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 45/00 (2006.01); A47B 57/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 45/00 (2013.01); A47B 57/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1483983 A1 20041208; GB 0313050 D0 20030709; GB 2402327 A 20041208; GB 2402327 B 20051019; US 2004245198 A1 20041209

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081216

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK