Global Patent Index - EP 1484227 A1

EP 1484227 A1 2004-12-08 - Side bearer

Title (en)

Side bearer

Title (de)

Gleitstück

Title (fr)

Lissoir

Publication

EP 1484227 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04253236 A

Priority

GB 0312870 A

Abstract (en)

A side bearer comprises a lower component 10, an upper component 20 guided for movement relative to the lower component 10, biassing means 18 urging the upper component 20 away from the lower component 10, and a friction plate 28 pivotally carried by the upper component 20. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484227 A1 20041208; GB 0312870 D0 20030709; GB 0412140 D0 20040630; GB 2402374 A 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071201

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMI

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK