Global Patent Index - EP 1484228 A1

EP 1484228 A1 2004-12-08 - Damping arrangements for Y25 bogies

Title (en)

Damping arrangements for Y25 bogies

Title (de)

Schwingungsdämpfende Einrichtungen für Y25 Drehgestelle

Title (fr)

Dispositifs ammortisseurs pour bogies Y25

Publication

EP 1484228 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04252767 A

Priority

GB 0311480 A

Abstract (en)

A bogie comprising a pedestal 10 supported through spring sets 14, 16 by an axle box 12, and a damping arrangement for damping relative vertical movement between the axle box 12 and the pedestal 10, the damping arrangement comprising a piston 26 guided for movement relative to the pedestal 10 and having a surface cooperable with a surface of the axle box 12, a drive arrangement 24 being provided to move the piston, and wherein the said surface of the piston 26 comprises a composite material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484228 A1 20041208; EP 1484228 B1 20090422; EP 1484228 B8 20090805; AT 429367 T 20090515; AT 553975 T 20120515; DE 602004020702 D1 20090604; EA 007260 B1 20060825; EA 200400559 A1 20041230; EP 1925526 A1 20080528; EP 1925526 B1 20120418; EP 2065285 A1 20090603; GB 0311480 D0 20030625; GB 0410857 D0 20040616; GB 0608204 D0 20060607; GB 0608205 D0 20060607; GB 0608207 D0 20060607; GB 0608209 D0 20060607; GB 2401844 A 20041124; GB 2401844 B 20060726; GB 2422587 A 20060802; GB 2422588 A 20060802; GB 2422589 A 20060802; GB 2422589 B 20061206; GB 2422814 A 20060809; GB 2422814 B 20071121

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-05-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WABTEC RAIL LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DB CARGO (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170508

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20161114

2016-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

2016-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WABTEC RAIL LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WABTEC RAIL LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 602004020702

- Effective date: 20130726

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091023

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090513

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090513

2010-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-02-26 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2009-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090802

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090822

2009-10-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-08-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-06-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004020702 P 20090604

2009-05-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMITED

2009-05-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEWITT, PAUL,RUA PRINCIPAL 56

2007-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070817

2005-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMI

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK