Global Patent Index - EP 1484270 A2

EP 1484270 A2 2004-12-08 - Device and method for gentle and wasteless further treatment of a remaining ream

Title (en)

Device and method for gentle and wasteless further treatment of a remaining ream

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur schonenden und abfallosen Weiterverarbeitung eines Restrieses

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de traitement ultérieur d'une rame résiduelle avec ménagement et sans déchets

Publication

EP 1484270 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04020937 A

Priority

EP 01710027 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure for the destacking of a defined number of sheets in a ream entails gripping of a residual ream (91) as a complete ream by a gripper (40), whereby a residual ream is assumed if the number of sheets of the pile remaining at the disposal location is less than the predetermined number of sheets which comprises a ream. The residual ream is moved away from the disposal location, a new pile (93) of sheets is made available at the disposal location, and the residual ream is moved back onto the new pile and laid upon it. An independent claim is included for a device for the destacking of a defined number of sheets in a ream.

Abstract (de)

Zum Entstapeln eines Stapels in Riese bestimmter Blattzahl entsteht am Ende ein Restries (91), das nicht mehr die vorgegebene Blattzahl hat. Dieses wird von einem Greifer ergriffen, von dem Bereitstellungsort weggefahren und solange dort gehalten, bis ein neuer Stapel bereitgestellt ist. Dann wird es auf den neuen Stapel (93) zurückgelegt und als Teil eines nunmehr vollständigen Rieses wiederum von dem Greifer ergriffen. Dabei kann das Wegführen von dem Bereitstellungsort dadurch geschehen, dass das Restries (91) auf einem Abtransportförderer (85) zumindest teilweise abgelegt wird oder es wird an seinen beiden Seiten durch entsprechende Greifer oder Halter (30, 40; 62) über dem Hubtisch (99) für den Stapelwechsel gehalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/322 (2013.01); B65H 83/025 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4223 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42242 (2013.01); B65H 2405/52 (2013.01); B65H 2511/30 (2013.01); B65H 2601/511 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484270 A2 20041208; EP 1484270 A3 20050105; EP 1484270 B1 20100811; DE 50110700 D1 20060921; DE 50115596 D1 20100923; EP 1264792 A1 20021211; EP 1264792 B1 20060809; ES 2269336 T3 20070401; ES 2349734 T3 20110111

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-07-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150730

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140608

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115596

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115596

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115596

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-01-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101228

2010-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2010-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115596 P 20100923

2010-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-08-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1264792 P

2010-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI SE

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI SE

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-12-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1264792 P

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI