Global Patent Index - EP 1484471 A2

EP 1484471 A2 2004-12-08 - Improved transmission element for downhole drilling components

Title (en)

Improved transmission element for downhole drilling components

Title (de)

Verbessertes Übertragungselement für Bestandteile eines Bohrlochbohrsystems

Title (fr)

Elément de transmission amélioré pour éléments de forage dans le puits

Publication

EP 1484471 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04253273 A

Priority

  • US 45307603 A
  • US 61225503 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for transmitting data between downhole tools is disclosed in one embodiment of the present invention as including an annular core (70) constructed of a magnetically-conductive material. At least one conductor (72), electrically isolated from the annular core, is coiled around the annular core. An annular housing (28) constructed of an electrically conductive material is used to partially enclose the annular core and the conductive coil. The annular housing is shaped to reside within an annular recess (76) formed into a surface of a downhole tool, and is electrically insulated from the surface. A biasing member (96) is used to effect a bias between the annular housing and the annular recess, urging the annular housing in a direction substantially perpendicular to the surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/02 (2006.01); E21B 47/12 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/028 (2013.01); E21B 47/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484471 A2 20041208; EP 1484471 A3 20041215; CA 2469574 A1 20041203; CA 2469574 C 20080527

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090806

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090326

2005-09-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB GR NL

2005-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK