Global Patent Index - EP 1484653 A3

EP 1484653 A3 2007-10-03 - Fine adjustment device

Title (en)

Fine adjustment device

Title (de)

Feinreguliervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage précis

Publication

EP 1484653 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04012670 A

Priority

DE 10326198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1484653A2] A hairspring (HS) key for altering the active length of an HS in a clock's oscillating system fits along with a radially aligned index regulator's (IR) (3) regulator pointer (RP) (5) on the IR with a radial gap from a regulator pin. A counter-pressure spring (8) has a spring arm fastened on a balance cock (1) with one end affecting the RP's oscillation and the other end under initial tension.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 18/02 (2006.01); G04B 18/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 18/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] CH 351220 A 19601231 - SURDEZ FERNAND [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL HR LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484653 A2 20041208; EP 1484653 A3 20071003; EP 1484653 B1 20091014; AT 445866 T 20091015; DE 10326198 A1 20041230; DE 502004010220 D1 20091126; JP 2004361389 A 20041224; US 2005013201 A1 20050120; US 7036977 B2 20060502

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100528

2010-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100715

2009-11-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004010220 P 20091126

2009-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2007-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2007-10-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04B 18/02 20060101AFI20070827BHEP

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK