Global Patent Index - EP 1484728 A2

EP 1484728 A2 2004-12-08 - Control apparatus for electric installations, in particular for domestic electric installations

Title (en)

Control apparatus for electric installations, in particular for domestic electric installations

Title (de)

Steuergerät für eine elektrische Einrichtung, insbesondere für häusliche, elektrische Einrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour une installation électrique, en particulier pour installations électriques domestiques

Publication

EP 1484728 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04102567 A

Priority

IT VA20030018 A

Abstract (en)

A control apparatus for electric installations comprises at least a control device (10) and at least a piloting device (30) for a load associated to the control device (10); the device further comprises supply means (21, 21', 21'') interconnected at least to the control device (10) and designed to supply the latter with a light energy coming from a room.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484728 A2 20041208; EP 1484728 A3 20060118; IT VA20030018 A1 20041206

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061120

2006-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK