Global Patent Index - EP 1484769 A2

EP 1484769 A2 2004-12-08 - Method for processing wastes intended for buried diposal

Title (en)

Method for processing wastes intended for buried diposal

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufbereiten von zum Eingraben bestimmten Abfallstoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de déchets destinés à être enfouis

Publication

EP 1484769 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 04291398 A

Priority

FR 0306855 A

Abstract (en)

Hazardous waste treatment method involves packing the waste into containers with permeable walls. Each container has a door with a locking catch and handles, hooks or other projections to facilitate handling. The apertures in the walls of the containers allow a covering material to penetrate and mix with the contents. Hazardous waste treatment method involves packing the waste (36) into containers (2) of 1 - 2 cu. m capacity with permeable walls, e.g. of galvanized steel mesh, with apertures measuring at least 20 x 20 up to 80 x 120 mm. Each container has a door with a locking catch and handles, hooks or other projections to facilitate handling. The apertures in the walls of the containers allow a covering material, such as sand, gravel or soil, to penetrate and mix with the contents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/00 (2006.01); G21F 9/26 (2006.01); G21F 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/36 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/60 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/40 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/601 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484769 A2 20041208; EP 1484769 A3 20051221; FR 2855903 A1 20041210; FR 2855903 B1 20050819

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070205

2006-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21F 9/36 A

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK