Global Patent Index - EP 1484776 A2

EP 1484776 A2 2004-12-08 - Air guiding device for cooling a component of a switch

Title (en)

Air guiding device for cooling a component of a switch

Title (de)

Luftleiteinrichtung zum Kühlen eines Schalterteiles eines elektrischen Schalters

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage d'air pour refroidir un composant d'un interrupteur

Publication

EP 1484776 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04090171 A

Priority

DE 10326355 A

Abstract (en)

An electric switch (1) has an air-conducting element (13) fitted with a gap away from a switching part needing to be cooled so as to form an air channel (AC) running vertically with the switch fitted flush. The AC has an inflow area pointing downwards to let cooling air flow in and an outflow area pointing upwards to let cooling air flow out. An independent claim is also included for an electric switch with disconnecting contact systems.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Luftleiteinrichtung (9) zum Kühlen eines Schalterteiles eines elektrischen Schalters (1) mit zumindest einem Luftleitelement (13), das unter Bildung zumindest eines in Einbaulage des Schalters vertikal verlaufenden Luftkanals (37) in einem Abstand zu dem zu kühlenden Schalterteil angeordnet ist, wobei der Luftkanal (37) einen nach unten weisenden Einströmbereich (40) zum Einströmen von Kühlluft und einen nach oben weisendes Ausströmbereich (31) zum Ausströmen der Kühlluft aufweist. Um die Wärmeabfuhr zu verbessern ist vorgesehen, das Luftleitelement (13) derart zu formen ist, dass sich der Einströmbereich (40) in Richtung auf den Ausströmbereich (31) verjüngt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/52; H02B 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/52 (2006.01); H01H 1/62 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/52 (2013.01); H01H 1/62 (2013.01); H01H 71/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484776 A2 20041208; EP 1484776 A3 20070221; DE 10326355 B3 20050203; US 2005006350 A1 20050113; US 7199318 B2 20070403

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081201

2007-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK