Global Patent Index - EP 1484820 A2

EP 1484820 A2 2004-12-08 - Electrical part for vehicle

Title (en)

Electrical part for vehicle

Title (de)

Elektrische Komponente eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Composant électrique pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1484820 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04010883 A

Priority

DE 20313457 U

Abstract (en)

A detachable plug-in connection (DPIC) (10) links on one side to a plug-retaining part (17) or can be connected to it. The DPIC has a plug (18) with a plug casing (19) as well as a connecting wire (20). Part of the control electronics (9) for an electric component (1), but preferably all the control electronics, fit in the DPIC. An independent claim is also included for a plug-in connection for a motor vehicle's electric component.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Komponente (1) eines Kraftfahrzeugs (2) mit einer Steuerelektronik (9) und mit mindestens einer Steckerverbindung (10) zur elektrischen Verbindung der elektrischen Komponente (1) mit einer übergeordneten Steuerung (11) oder einer weiteren elektrischen Komponente, wobei die Steckerverbindung (10) jedenfalls einseitig mit einer Steckeraufnahme (17) lösbar verbunden oder verbindbar ist und wobei die Steckerverbindung (10) jedenfalls einen Stecker (18) mit einem Steckergehäuse (19) sowie eine Verbindungsleitung (20) aufweist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß zumindest ein Teil der Steuerelektronik (9) der elektrischen Komponente (1), vorzugsweise die gesamte Steuerelektronik (9) der elektrischen Komponente (1), in der Steckerverbindung (10) untergebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 33/945 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/065 (2013.01); H01R 13/665 (2013.01); H01R 33/945 (2013.01); H01R 2201/20 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01); Y10S 439/949 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484820 A2 20041208; EP 1484820 A3 20060125; DE 10341254 A1 20050113; US 2005026470 A1 20050203; US 6991476 B2 20060131

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081201

2006-12-13 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-11-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK