Global Patent Index - EP 1485173 A1

EP 1485173 A1 2004-12-15 - SNOWBOARD BINDING

Title (en)

SNOWBOARD BINDING

Title (de)

SNOWBOARDBINDUNG

Title (fr)

FIXATION DE SURF DES NEIGES

Publication

EP 1485173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03706195 A

Priority

  • CH 0300169 W
  • CH 4302002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076030A1] The invention relates to a snowboard binding (1) comprising a base plate (2) and a means (3) for fastening a snowboard boot. Said snowboard binding is provided with at least one load introducing means (7, 8), the angle, arrangement, and direction of which in relation to the base plate is adjustable in an essentially independent manner. The at least one load introducing means (7, 8) transfers forces between a snowboard boot and a snowboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01); A63C 10/28 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/285 (2013.01); A63C 10/14 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01); A63C 10/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03076030A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076030 A1 20030918; AU 2003208242 A1 20030922; CN 1642604 A 20050720; EP 1485173 A1 20041215; US 2005253347 A1 20051117

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072017

2008-03-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-08-12 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072017

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHAUN PALMER LIMITED

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO