Global Patent Index - EP 1485350 A1

EP 1485350 A1 2004-12-15 - USE OF UNSATURATED KETONES AS A PERFUME

Title (en)

USE OF UNSATURATED KETONES AS A PERFUME

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN KETONE ALS RIECHSTOFFE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE CETONES INSATUREES EN TANT QUE SUBSTANCES ODORANTES

Publication

EP 1485350 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03744331 A

Priority

  • DE 10212026 A
  • EP 0301561 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03078391A1] Unsaturated ketones of general formula (I) where the groups R1, R2, R3, R4 and R5 independently = H or 1-6 C alkyl groups, which can be saturated or unsaturated, straight-chained, branched or cyclic are characterised by an interesting and original odour characteristic with good emanation and are suitable for use as perfumes, for example in cosmetic preparations, technical products or alcoholic perfumery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 403/16; A61K 7/46; C11B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 45/68 (2006.01); C07C 403/16 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 49/543 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03078391A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 03078391 A1 20030925; DE 10212026 A1 20031002; EP 1485350 A1 20041215; EP 1485350 B1 20130717; ES 2426001 T3 20131018; JP 2005520875 A 20050714; JP 4346448 B2 20091021; US 2005119158 A1 20050602; US 2009054299 A1 20090226; US 7582600 B2 20090901

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50314840

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140422

2013-10-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2426001 T3

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-09-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50314840

- Effective date: 20130905

2013-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG, CH

2013-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2013-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/35 20060101ALI20130115BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 403/16 20060101AFI20130115BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11B 9/00 20060101ALI20130115BHEP

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090305

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR