Global Patent Index - EP 1485419 A1

EP 1485419 A1 2004-12-15 - FOAMS CONTAINING SILICON

Title (en)

FOAMS CONTAINING SILICON

Title (de)

SILICONHALTIGE SCHAUMSTOFFE

Title (fr)

MOUSSES CONTENANT DE LA SILICONE

Publication

EP 1485419 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03744776 A

Priority

  • DE 10212658 A
  • EP 0300702 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03080696A1] The invention relates to foamable preparations comprised of the following constituents: (A) linear or branched organopolysiloxanes whose chain ends are terminated up to at least 95 % with aminoalkyl groups or hydroxyalkyl groups of general formula (1) -O-SiR<1>2O-SiR<2>2-R<3>-Z that can be produced by reacting linear or branched organopolysiloxanes, which have terminal groups of general formula (2) -O-SiR<1>2-OH, with organosilicon compounds, which are composed of structural elements of general formula (3) - [SiR<2>2-R<3>-Y-]k, whereby R<1>, R<2>, R<3>, Z, Y and k have the meanings as cited in Claim No. 1; (B) di- or polyisocyanates, and; (C) expanding agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/61

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/61 (2006.01); C08G 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/61 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0008 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03080696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 03080696 A1 20031002; CN 1285635 C 20061122; CN 1643020 A 20050720; DE 10212658 A1 20031016; EP 1485419 A1 20041215; EP 1485419 B1 20050615; JP 2005520035 A 20050707; JP 4215649 B2 20090128; US 2005131088 A1 20050616; US 2008051482 A1 20080228

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150123

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150123

2015-08-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50300661

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *WACKER CHEMIE A.G.HANNS-SEIDEL-PLATZ 4, D-81737 M

- Effective date: 20050615

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *WACKER CHEMIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20050615

2007-09-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WACKER CHEMIE AG

- Effective date: 20070516

2007-06-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50300661 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR