Global Patent Index - EP 1485511 A2

EP 1485511 A2 2004-12-15 - HIGH-RESISTANT, LOW-DENSITY HOT LAMINATED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

HIGH-RESISTANT, LOW-DENSITY HOT LAMINATED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

WARMGEWALZTES HOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH MIT NIEDRIGER DICHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

TOLE D'ACIER LAMINEE A CHAUD A TRES HAUTE RESISTANCE ET DE FAIBLE DENSITE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1485511 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 03725278 A

Priority

  • FR 0300765 W
  • FR 0202998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03076673A2] The invention relates to a high-resistant, low-density hot laminated sheet steel comprising the following elements expressed in weight per cent: 0.04 %:9 carbon _< 0.5 %; 0.05 % <_ manganese <_ 3 %, being able to contain hardening elements: 0.01 %<_ niobium<_ 0.1 0.01 %<_ titanium<_ 0.2 % 0.01 <_ vanadium <_ 0.2 %, either individually or combined,, and/or elements acting on the transformation temperatures, 0.0005 % <_ boron <_ 0.005 %; 0.05 %<_ nickel<_ 2 %;0.05 % <_ chrome <_ 2 %; 0.05 %<_ molybdenum <_ 2 %, either individually or combined, the remainder being iron and elements which are inherent to production, characterized in that it comprises: 2 % <_ silicon <_ 10 %; 1 % <_ aluminium <_ 10 %,. The invention also relates to the production thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03076673A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03076673 A2 20030918; WO 03076673 A3 20040422; WO 03076673 A8 20040930; AT 312206 T 20051215; AU 2003227824 A1 20030922; AU 2003227824 A8 20030922; BR 0308328 A 20041228; BR 0308328 B1 20111101; CA 2478123 A1 20030918; CA 2478123 C 20110125; CN 1306046 C 20070321; CN 1688725 A 20051026; DE 60302659 D1 20060112; DE 60302659 T2 20060720; EP 1485511 A2 20041215; EP 1485511 B1 20051207; ES 2252671 T3 20060516; FR 2836930 A1 20030912; FR 2836930 B1 20050225; JP 2005527701 A 20050915; JP 4638152 B2 20110223; KR 100986697 B1 20101008; KR 20040088583 A 20041016; MX PA04008717 A 20041206; RU 2004129774 A 20050820; RU 2323983 C2 20080510; US 2006231177 A1 20061019; US 7416615 B2 20080826

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080710

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2008-06-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2006-10-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20060907

2006-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-07-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-06-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

2006-06-08 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2252671 T3

2006-05-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-03-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-03-07 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-03-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-03-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60302659 P 20060112

2005-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-06-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HIGH-RESISTANT, LOW-DENSITY HOT LAMINATED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BANO, XAVIER

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIRAUD, CHRISTIAN

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK