Global Patent Index - EP 1485589 A1

EP 1485589 A1 2004-12-15 - A DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF A GAS FLOW

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF A GAS FLOW

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GASSTROMS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN ECOULEMENT GAZEUX

Publication

EP 1485589 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03703632 A

Priority

  • SE 0300222 W
  • SE 0200452 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03069138A1] The invention concerns a device for treatment of a gas flow, comprising at least one body 3, at least one first opening 4, 4' for entrance of an incoming gas flow to said body 3 and at least one second opening 5, 5' for the exit of an outgoing gas flow from said body 3, wherein said body 3 is provided with a plurality of gas flow passages 11a, 11b arranged to permit heat exchange between the gas flows in adjacent passages. The invention is characterized in that the device comprises at least one distribution section 26, 26' in communication with the first opening 4, 4' and with the gas flow passages 11a, 11b to distribute the incoming gas flow to the gas flow passages 11a, 11b, and at least one gas flow passage section 27, 27' including said gas flow passages 11a, 11b, which passage section 27, 27' primarily is adapted to permit heat exchange and to cause a conversion in the composition of the gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/02 (2006.01); B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01J 35/02 (2006.01); B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/022 (2006.01); F01N 3/035 (2006.01); F01N 3/037 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/24 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 3/36 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0217 (2013.01); F01N 3/022 (2013.01); F01N 3/035 (2013.01); F01N 3/037 (2013.01); F01N 3/2807 (2013.01); F01N 3/281 (2013.01); F01N 3/2828 (2013.01); F01N 3/2889 (2013.01); F01N 3/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03069138A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03069138 A1 20030821; AT 431492 T 20090515; AU 2003206339 A1 20030904; DE 60327609 D1 20090625; EP 1485589 A1 20041215; EP 1485589 B1 20090513; JP 2005517853 A 20050616; JP 4499424 B2 20100707; SE 0200452 D0 20020215; SE 0200452 L 20031013; SE 524226 C2 20040713

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160211

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160212

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160211

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60327609

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2012-09-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091114

2012-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, , US

- Document: DE 60327609

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLVO CAR CORPORATION, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, , US

- Document: DE 60327609

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., GOETEBORG/GOTENBURG, SE; FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, DEARBORN, MICH., US

- Document: DE 60327609

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLVO CAR CORPORATION, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORP., GOETEBORG/GOTENBURG, SE; FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, DEARBORN, MICH., US

- Document: DE 60327609

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-03-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60327609

- Representative's name: LOUIS, POEHLAU, LOHRENTZ, DE

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-02-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60327609

- Representative's name: LOUIS, POEHLAU, LOHRENTZ, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090814

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100216

2010-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090813

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2010-02-26 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2010-01-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2010-01-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-11-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090913

2009-09-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-06-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60327609 P 20090625

2009-06-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOBSON, EDWARD

2009-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOLMGREN HAEGG, ANNA

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLVO TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLVO TEKNISK UTVECKLING AB

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO