Global Patent Index - EP 1485654 A1

EP 1485654 A1 2004-12-15 - HEATING SYSTEM, METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEATING SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

HEATING SYSTEM, METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEATING SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

HEIZUNGSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES HEIZUNGSSYSTEMS UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE, PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL SYSTEME

Publication

EP 1485654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03706561 A

Priority

  • DE 10207635 A
  • DE 10234270 A
  • EP 0301837 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03071193A2] The invention relates to a heating system for generating and distributing thermal energy, comprising one or more circulation systems for distributing the heat, heating circuits for generating heat and at least one storage element (14). For economical storage of large amounts of heat and in order to improve the efficiency of the system, the heating system is dependent on a level of fluid and the circulation systems, e.g. for heating (23-29), storage connection, domestic water heating (26, 30-32), after-heating, heat exchange, storage collectors (5, 7-10), heating boiler (33-38), heating pumps, procurement of heat and cooling, are connected directly to the storage element (14), whereby the storage fluid is used directly by the circulation systems. Supply devices, such as filling devices (26, 30) or (34) or devices increasing the level of fluid, introduce the fluid into the circulation system before circulation and/or supply devices keep the fluid in the circulation system and/or the circulation systems dependent on the level of fluid are provided with a emergency filling device (31, 33). The invention also relates to a method for operating a heating system and to the use thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/02 (2006.01); F24D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0092 (2013.01); F24D 3/02 (2013.01); F24D 3/1083 (2013.01); F24D 11/002 (2013.01); Y02B 10/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03071193A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03071193 A2 20030828; WO 03071193 A8 20050224; EP 1485654 A1 20041215; US 2005161520 A1 20050728

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-12-23 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION

- Free text: FESTSTELLUNG EINES RECHTSVERLUSTS NACH REGEL 112(1) EPUE

2008-12-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAST, KARL HEINZ

2008-12-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAST, KARL HEINZ

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050805

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO