Global Patent Index - EP 1485662 A1

EP 1485662 A1 2004-12-15 - MOLDED CORE FILTER DRIER

Title (en)

MOLDED CORE FILTER DRIER

Title (de)

TROCKNUNGSFILTER MIT GEFORMTEM KERN

Title (fr)

DESHYDRATEUR A NOYAU AGGLOMERE

Publication

EP 1485662 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03734975 A

Priority

  • US 0301920 W
  • US 5720702 A
  • US 19525702 A
  • US 19523902 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03064941A1] This filter-drier (10,110,210,310) for removing moisture from a refrigerant includes a casing (12, 112, 212, 320) having an inlet (16, 116, 216, 316) for receiving refrigerant, an outlet (18, 118, 218, 318) for discharging refrigerant and a molded core (30, 130, 230, 330). In one embodiment (FIG. 1), the molded core (30) includes an outer surface at least in part engaging the inner surface of the casing (12). The core (30) is held within the casing (12) against axial movement by bonding with the casing or by an indentation (22) protruding into the core or both. In another embodiment (FIG. 7), the filter-drier molded core (130) includes a filter media pad (150) bonded to the core. In another embodiment (FIG. 11), the filter-drier (310) suitable for reversible operation includes a hollow cylindrical core (330) defining a filter media lined passage (332) and being held in place by end plates (340, 341) having opposed axial check valves (342) and offset check valves (344). Methods of manufacturing the above filter-driers (10, 110, 210, 310) are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 43/00; B01D 27/08; B01D 53/04; B01D 53/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 35/02 (2006.01); B01D 53/04 (2006.01); B01D 53/26 (2006.01); F25B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/0415 (2013.01); B01D 35/02 (2013.01); B01D 53/261 (2013.01); B01D 53/266 (2013.01); F25B 43/003 (2013.01); B01D 53/0431 (2013.01); B01D 53/0438 (2013.01); B01D 2201/02 (2013.01); B01D 2201/4076 (2013.01); B01D 2253/102 (2013.01); B01D 2253/104 (2013.01); B01D 2253/106 (2013.01); B01D 2253/25 (2013.01); B01D 2257/80 (2013.01); B01D 2259/455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03064941A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03064941 A1 20030807; CN 1303384 C 20070307; CN 1643315 A 20050720; EP 1485662 A1 20041215; HK 1080931 A1 20071012

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072289

2012-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110628

2009-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090513

2005-08-19 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072289

2005-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO