Global Patent Index - EP 1485987 A1

EP 1485987 A1 2004-12-15 - POLYPHASE BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR

Title (en)

POLYPHASE BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR

Title (de)

MEHRPHASIGER KOLLEKTORLOSER GLEICHSTROMMOTOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU POLYPHASE SANS COLLECTEUR

Publication

EP 1485987 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03735584 A

Priority

  • DE 10228438 A
  • EP 0306023 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004004111A1] Disclosed is a polyphase brushless DC motor (20) comprising a permanent-magnet rotor (28), a polyphase stator (22, 24, 26), and a polyphase full-bridge circuit that is assigned to the polyphase stator (22, 24, 26) and is provided with a plurality of bridge branches, each of which is provided with an upper field-effect power transistor (90, 108, 120) that is connected to a positive line (22) and a lower field-effect power transistor (96, 112, 124) that is connected to a negative line (100). Said motor (20) also comprises a rotor position sensor arrangement (30, 32, 34) which generates a plurality of mutually phase-shifted sensor signals (H1, H2, H3) when the motor (20) is in an operating state, the analogous value of said sensor signals (H1, H2, H3) depending on a rotor position-dependent physical variable that acts upon the rotor position sensor arrangement. Signals (54, 56, 58) that are derived from the rotor position sensor arrangement (30, 32, 34) are compared with a periodic sawtooth signal (u70) so as to obtain a plurality of comparative PWM signals (PWM1, PWM2, PWM3), the pulse duty factor of which is a function of the momentary value of the associated sensor signal (H1, H2, H3). The information contained in a comparative PWM signal is supplied to the two power field effect transistors (90, 96; 108, 112; 120, 124) of an associated bridge branch via one respective driver (86, 104, 116) in the form of signals that are in phase opposition in order to trigger said field effect transistors in a hard chopping mode and allow multiquadrant operation of the motor (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02P 6/16; H02K 29/08; H02P 7/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 6/16 (2006.01); H02P 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02P 6/16 (2013.01); H02P 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2004004111A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004004111 A1 20040108; AU 2003236721 A1 20040119; DE 10326869 A1 20040122; EP 1485987 A1 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120103

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091123

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUDEL, CHRISTIAN

2006-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAPPENECKER, HERMANN

2005-10-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK