Global Patent Index - EP 1486086 A1

EP 1486086 A1 2004-12-15 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SOLVING A MISMATCH IN UMTS-COMMUNICATION NETWORKS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SOLVING A MISMATCH IN UMTS-COMMUNICATION NETWORKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFLÖSUNG EINER FEHLANPASSUNG IN UMTS-KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SUPPRIMER UN DEFAUT D'ADAPTATION DANS DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION UMTS

Publication

EP 1486086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02727240 A

Priority

DE 0200976 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03079711A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for solving a mismatch between voice data transmitted in a voice codec mode having a first allocation indicator for the voice codec-mode in a first network section, and voice data transmitted in a voice codec mode having a second allocation indicator in a second network section. The voice data is guided to a transcoder output by bypassing an encoding and decoding device and a time-division- multiplexing-coupling field.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/181 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03079711A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03079711 A1 20030925; AU 2002257534 A1 20030929; BR 0215649 A 20041221; CN 1623337 A 20050601; DE 10296658 D2 20050127; EP 1486086 A1 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080827

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHMANN, FRANK

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEDELEC, THIERRY

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMUTZLER, WERNER

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEITTER, NORBERT

2005-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VALENZUELA, ALEJANDRO

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI