Global Patent Index - EP 1486148 A1

EP 1486148 A1 2004-12-15 - Refrigerated display cabinets

Title (en)

Refrigerated display cabinets

Title (de)

Gekühlte Ausstellungsschränke

Title (fr)

Armoires de présentation réfrigérées

Publication

EP 1486148 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03253665 A

Priority

EP 03253665 A

Abstract (en)

An open faced refrigerated display cabinet 100 comprises a plurality of product receiving compartments 106, 108, 110, 112 arranged one above the other. Each compartment comprises an evaporator and fan system 138 for producing a generally horizontal air curtain 142 across the opening 144 to the compartment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0452 (2013.01); A47F 3/0447 (2013.01); A47F 2003/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1486148 A1 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100225

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIJK, MATHIJS VAN

2005-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZANNESE, DAVIDE

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK