Global Patent Index - EP 1486233 A1

EP 1486233 A1 2004-12-15 - Protective headgear equipment with respirator and protection screen

Title (en)

Protective headgear equipment with respirator and protection screen

Title (de)

Kopfschutzgerät mit Atemschutzmaske und Schutzschild

Title (fr)

Equipement de protection de tête à masque respiratoire et écran de protection

Publication

EP 1486233 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 04291336 A

Priority

FR 0306963 A

Abstract (en)

The equipment has a respiratory mask (2) connected to a respiratory gas source and applied around nose and mouth of a user in usage position to supply the gas. An eye protection shield (6) is applied around users eyes. A locking tab and a coupling nose respectively situated on the mask and the shield allow to move the shield with respect to the mask and aid the application of the shield on the users face. The locking tab and the coupling nose cooperate with each other to fix the eye protection shield (6) on the respiratory mask (2), when the mask is in usage position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1486233 A1 20041215; EP 1486233 B1 20100120; CA 2469964 A1 20041210; DE 602004025172 D1 20100311; FR 2855976 A1 20041217; FR 2855976 B1 20060324

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-05-26 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004025172 P 20100311

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2010-01-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2005-06-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK