Global Patent Index - EP 1486454 A1

EP 1486454 A1 2004-12-15 - MACHINE FOR TREATING CONTAINERS COMPRISING A CLOSED SPACE

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR TREATING CONTAINERS COMPRISING A CLOSED SPACE

Title (de)

BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE MIT ABGESCHLOSSENEM RAUM

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE RECIPIENTS ayant UNe enceinte fermée

Publication

EP 1486454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04005232 A

Priority

DE 10326618 A

Abstract (en)

An assembly rinses, fills and seals drinks containers e.g. PET bottles. The assembly has a rotating horizontal carousel that grips the bottles at carousel periphery. The open bottle necks are inserted into a chamber containing an inert gas, the chambers being is essentially enclosed. The chamber envelopes only the neck part of the bottle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Behälterbehandlungsmaschine für Getränkebehälter wie Flaschen und dgl. mit einem um eine vertikale Achse umlaufenden Karussell mit auf Abstand angeordneten Behandlungsplätzen für die Aufnahme der Getränkebehälter, wobei die Behandlungsplätze in einem mit Sonderatmosphäre beaufschlagten im wesentlichen abgeschlossenen Raum angeordnet sind, welcher aus rotierenden und demgegenüber feststehenden Raumteilen besteht und zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass dieser Raum (15) nur einen Teil der Getränkebehälter (16) mindestens mit deren Mündungsbereich (17) umschließt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 7/00; B65B 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/24 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01); B65B 31/02 (2006.01); B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 7/0086 (2013.01); B65B 31/022 (2013.01); B65B 31/027 (2013.01); B67C 2003/2697 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1486454 A1 20041215; EP 1486454 B1 20091118; DE 10326618 A1 20050105; DE 502004010381 D1 20091231; JP 2005001767 A 20050106; PL 198414 B1 20080630; PL 368476 A1 20041227; RU 2004117844 A 20060110; RU 2342314 C2 20081227; US 2005016624 A1 20050127; US 7165582 B2 20070123

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111114

2010-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100819

2010-07-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

2009-12-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004010381 P 20091231

2009-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2009-11-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS AG

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-03-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MACHINE FOR TREATING CONTAINERS COMPRISING A CLOSED SPACE

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK