Global Patent Index - EP 1486636 A2

EP 1486636 A2 2004-12-15 - Composite wood-metal window

Title (en)

Composite wood-metal window

Title (de)

Holz-Metallfenstersystem

Title (fr)

Fenêtre mixte bois-métal

Publication

EP 1486636 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04012823 A

Priority

DE 10327004 A

Abstract (en)

A combined wood and metal window frame jig is used both for the assembly and repair of new wood and metal window frames. The window component parts are placed in predetermined locations and are then surrounded by a commensurate frame profile (6) in which they rest in accurate alignment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Holz-Metallfenstersystem mit mehreren, in einem gemeinsamen Feld 1 liegenden, benachbarten Elementen, insbesondere Fenstern 2 und/oder Festverglasungen 3 und/oder Türen mit Blendrahmen 4 aus Holz sowie Blendrahmenprofilen 6 aus Metall, die mittels Halter 10 auf den Blendrahmen 4 aufgebracht sind, wobei die Blendrahmen 4 der einzelnen Elemente mit einzelnen, zugehörigen Blendrahmenprofilen 6 versehen sind, die auf die Länge der Blendrahmen 4 der einzelnen Elemente abgestimmt sind, so dass jedes einzelne Element von einem um Letzteres umlaufenden Blendrahmenprofil 6 umgeben ist und mittels der Blendrahmenprofile 6 bei benachbarten Elementen unterschiedlicher Blendrahmenbreite die außenseitigen Enden der Blendrahmenprofile 6 entlang einer optisch abgestimmten, gemeinsamen Außenkante 8 des Felds 1 liegen. Des weiteren betrifft die Erfindung ein Blendrahmenprofil für ein Holz-Metallfenstersystem, insbesondere nach einem der Ansprüche 1 bis 9 mit einem Verblendungsbereich 11, einem Überschlagbereich 12 sowie einem Befestigungsausschnitt 9, wobei das Blendrahmenprofil 6 in dem dem Überschlagbereich 12 abgewandten Endbereich eine Aufnahme zum Einsatz eines Aussteifungswinkels aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/36 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/36 (2013.01); E06B 3/302 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29809594 U1 19980813 - GUTMANN HERMANN WERKE GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1486636 A2 20041215; EP 1486636 A3 20051005; EP 1486636 B1 20090311; AT 425339 T 20090315; DE 10327004 A1 20050105; DE 502004009117 D1 20090423

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [REG PL LAPE] DECISIONS ON THE LAPSE OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN THE TERRITORY OF THE REPUBLIC OF POLAND

2014-08-29 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-02-28 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-02-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130530

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004009117

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-17 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E003186

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-04 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 5672

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 425339 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-08-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20120528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20120517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GUTMANN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE AG, 91781 WEISSENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 502004009117

- Effective date: 20110311

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-02-04 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: GUTMANN AG, WEISSENBURG, DE

- Document: SK E 5672

- Effective date: 20101220

2010-12-28 [REG HU HC9C] CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS

- Owner name: GUTMANN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER(S): HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE AG, DE

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE A.G.

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090622

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-10-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E005776

2009-10-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090611

2009-08-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-07-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-06-05 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004009117 P 20090423

2009-04-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOBER, WERNER

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOLD, MATTHIAS

2008-10-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITE WOOD-METAL WINDOW

2006-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-10-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK