Global Patent Index - EP 1486638 A1

EP 1486638 A1 2004-12-15 - Drop seal for a door without sill

Title (en)

Drop seal for a door without sill

Title (de)

Absenkdichtung für eine schwellenlose Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité descendant pour porte sans seuil

Publication

EP 1486638 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04021863 A

Priority

  • CH 18702000 A
  • EP 01810893 A

Abstract (en)

A door has a frame with no threshold but a recessed channel (10) into which the door is lowered with a seal (11). Both the profile and the seal incorporate an aperture (24, 14). The profile (10) has a pushrod guide (18) and a thin zone (23).

Abstract (de)

Ein Treibriegel (3, 13, 23) für eine schwellenlose Mehrflügeltür (1) besteht aus einer sich durch den in einem Flügel (1) der Mehrflügeltür angeordneten Betätigungsmechanismus des Treibriegels hindurch erstreckenden Stange (13). Ferner betrifft die Erfindung eine Absenkdichtung (2) zur Verwendung mit einem solchen Treibriegel (3, 13, 23). Dabei ist die Stange (13) mindestens in ihrem eine absenkbare Absenkdichtung (2) durchstossenden Abschnitt abgeflacht (23) und die Absenkdichtung (2) weist eine entsprechende führende Öffnung für den abgeflachten Abschnitt (23) auf. Dabei verfügt das Dichtungsprofil (11) der Absenkdichtung (2) in der zum Anpressen auf einen Boden (4) vorgesehenen Dichtfläche über eine den abgeflachten Abschnitt (23) durchlassende Öffnung (14). Bei asymmetrisch bezüglich der Mittelebene (25) der Absenkdichtung (2) und verschoben in Richtung des sich schliessenden Flügels (1) angeordneter Öffnung (14) in dem Dichtungsprofil (11) ist die Funktion des Schliessens des Treibriegels (3) mit vollständiger Dichtheit der Tür besonders einfach zu bewerkstelligen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/20; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E06B 7/20 (2006.01); E05C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/20 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H11117640 A 19990427 - MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DD 291117 A5 19910620 - BAUELEMENTE U FASERBAUSTOFFE F [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191182 A2 20020327; EP 1191182 A3 20021106; EP 1191182 B1 20050302; AT 290152 T 20050315; AT 513112 T 20110715; DE 50105450 D1 20050407; EP 1486638 A1 20041215; EP 1486638 B1 20110615; ES 2239117 T3 20050916

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110917

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110926

2012-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115906

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-06-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2012-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PLANET GDZ A.G.

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111017

2012-01-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110916

2011-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-09-21 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2011-07-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50115906

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-07-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-06-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1191182 P

2011-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2011-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081117

2008-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLANET GDZ AG

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040915

- Countries: SI

2005-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLANET GDZ AG

2004-12-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1191182 P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI