Global Patent Index - EP 1487002 A2

EP 1487002 A2 2004-12-15 - Electrical remote actuation device

Title (en)

Electrical remote actuation device

Title (de)

Elektrische Fernbedienung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique d'actionnement à distance

Publication

EP 1487002 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04002046 A

Priority

IT MI20030991 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical remote actuation device that includes an electric motor (30) that, through a control mechanism, actuates the rotation of an actuation shaft (102) that is associated with a kinematic system for the actuation of an electrical circuit breaker. The control mechanism includes a preloaded spring (28) that provides the actuation shaft with the impulse to open or close the circuit breaker with sufficient speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/70; H01H 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/16 (2006.01); H01H 71/70 (2006.01); H01H 9/28 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/16 (2013.01); H01H 71/70 (2013.01); H01H 9/281 (2013.01); H01H 71/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1487002 A2 20041215; EP 1487002 A3 20050112; IT MI20030991 A1 20041121

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-11-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK