Global Patent Index - EP 1487237 B1

EP 1487237 B1 2009-02-18 - Earhook of a hearing aid

Title (en)

Earhook of a hearing aid

Title (de)

Winkelstück an Hörgeräten

Title (fr)

Crochet pour oreille d'une prothèse auditive

Publication

EP 1487237 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04023116 A

Priority

EP 04023116 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1487237A1] The hearing aid (3) has an output for acoustic or sound signals, a tubular connection element and/or an angled part (21) on the output for connecting the output to a hose for acoustic transmission into or to the ear canal. The connecting element and/or angled part has a thread (23) for connecting the hose. Independent claims are also included for the following: (a) an angled part or ear hook on a hearing aid arrangement (b) and a method of connecting an acoustic transmission hose to an angled part or ear hook.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/02 (2013.01); H04R 2225/021 (2013.01); H04R 2225/63 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1487237 A1 20041215; EP 1487237 B1 20090218; DE 502004008999 D1 20090402; DK 1487237 T3 20090615

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004008999

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150930

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008999 P 20090402

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050427

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK