Global Patent Index - EP 1487253 A2

EP 1487253 A2 2004-12-22 - PLANT PRESERVATION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

PLANT PRESERVATION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

PFLANZENFRISCHHALTESYSTEME

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES DE CONSERVATION DES PLANTES

Publication

EP 1487253 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 03744158 A

Priority

  • US 0306514 W
  • US 36200202 P
  • US 18866302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03075638A2] The present invention provides, e.g., methods, devices and compositions to preserve plants, such as cut flowers. The methods include, e.g., sealing cut stems in antimicrobial preservative media and sealing the flowers in an inert gas environment. The devices include, e.g., packaging materials and media to vitalize and protect uprooted plants and/or cut flowers. The compositions of the invention provide, e.g., media which inhibit microbe growth and vitalize cut plants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01B 79/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 5/06 (2006.01); A01B 79/00 (2006.01); A01B 79/02 (2006.01); A01C 1/00 (2006.01); A01G 1/00 (2006.01); A01H 3/00 (2006.01); A01N 3/00 (2006.01); A01N 3/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A01G (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 3/02 (2013.01); A01G 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03075638 A2 20030918; WO 03075638 A3 20040422; AU 2003216498 A1 20030922; AU 2003216498 A8 20030922; CA 2478551 A1 20030918; EP 1487253 A2 20041222; EP 1487253 A4 20060802; JP 2005519125 A 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090505

2006-08-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01G 5/06 20060101AFI20060328BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01B 79/00 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2005-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01B 79/00 A

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK