Global Patent Index - EP 1487414 A2

EP 1487414 A2 2004-12-22 - ANTIBIOTIC COMPOSITION

Title (en)

ANTIBIOTIC COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ANTIBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ANTIBIOTIQUE

Publication

EP 1487414 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 03714005 A

Priority

  • US 0307118 W
  • US 9281102 A
  • US 9285402 A
  • US 9285802 A
  • US 9321402 A
  • US 9332102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03075852A2] Antibiotic products for delivering at least two different antibiotics, wherein the products are comprised of at least three or four dosage forms with different release profiles and the at least two different antibiotics are selected from specified antibiotic pairs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/14; A61K 9/22; A61K 9/24; A61K 9/28; A61K 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7048 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/22 (2006.01); A61K 9/26 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/43 (2006.01); A61K 31/431 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/65 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 9/2081 (2013.01); A61K 31/65 (2013.01); A61K 9/1623 (2013.01); A61K 9/1652 (2013.01); A61K 9/5026 (2013.01); A61K 9/5047 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/65 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03075852 A2 20030918; WO 03075852 A3 20040715; AU 2003218024 A1 20030922; AU 2003218024 B2 20080911; CA 2478121 A1 20030918; EP 1487414 A2 20041222; EP 1487414 A4 20071212; JP 2005526059 A 20050902

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIDDLEBROOK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIDDLEBROOK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2007-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071114

2006-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUDNIC, EDWARD, M.

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISBISTER, JAMES, D.

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TREACY, JR., DONALD, J.

2005-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WASSINK, SANDRA, E.

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK