Global Patent Index - EP 1488089 A1

EP 1488089 A1 2004-12-22 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PIEZO-ACTUATOR OF A PIEZO-CONTROL VALVE OF A PUMP NOZZLE UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PIEZO-ACTUATOR OF A PIEZO-CONTROL VALVE OF A PUMP NOZZLE UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG DES PIEZO-AKTUATORS EINES PIEZO-STEUERVENTILS EINER PUMPE-DÜSE-EINHEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE L'ACTIONNEUR PIEZOELECTRIQUE DE LA SOUPAPE DE DISTRIBUTION PIEZOELECTRIQUE D'UNE UNITE DE POMPE D'INJECTION

Publication

EP 1488089 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03727149 A

Priority

  • DE 0300956 W
  • DE 10214206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03083278A1] In order to close the piezo-control valve (22) of a pump-nozzle unit, the piezo-actuator (76) is controlled by means of at least one first current pulse (I1) and a second current pulse (I2) occurring at a specific time duration therefrom instead of a single pulse current packet. A bounce pulse occurring when the valve needle (48) impacts upon the valve seat (62) is thus avoided or at least prevented. Optionally, a partial current level (IT) is maintained between the first current pulse (I1) and the second current pulse (I2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; F02M 57/02; F02M 59/36; H01L 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); H02N 2/04 (2006.01); H02N 2/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2096 (2013.01); F02M 57/023 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 2200/04 (2013.01); F02M 2200/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03083278A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03083278 A1 20031009; EP 1488089 A1 20041222; EP 1488089 B1 20051221

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50301997

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-09-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051221

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50301997 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040828

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR