Global Patent Index - EP 1488167 A1

EP 1488167 A1 2004-12-22 - A LUMINAIRE ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

A LUMINAIRE ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

LEUCHTENANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE LUMINAIRE

Publication

EP 1488167 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03702202 A

Priority

  • AU 0300234 W
  • AU PS080102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03072998A1] A tensioning mechanism for the reflector of a doubly arched luminaire, the mechanism being either a flexible filament (104) with bulbous protrusions (144) that pass through an aperture (147) but are prevented from passing through extensions of the aperture or a swing arm (151) pivotably mounted on one side of the reflector and having hooks to attach the arm to one of a plurality of apertures (156) on the other side of the reflector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/10 (2006.01); F21V 7/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21V 7/10 (2013.01); F21V 7/16 (2013.01); F21V 17/007 (2013.01); F21V 19/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03072998 A1 20030904; AT 503965 T 20110415; AU 2003205431 A1 20030909; AU 2003205431 B2 20081106; AU PS080102 A0 20020321; CA 2516674 A1 20030904; CA 2516674 C 20110104; CA 2718181 A1 20030904; CA 2718181 C 20120103; CA 2754628 A1 20030904; CA 2754628 C 20130514; DE 60336547 D1 20110512; DK 1488167 T3 20110711; EP 1488167 A1 20041222; EP 1488167 A4 20080604; EP 1488167 B1 20110330; ES 2362215 T3 20110629; NZ 535580 A 20081031; NZ 568876 A 20091224; NZ 568877 A 20081128

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20180213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120226

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2013-06-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-09-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60336547

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120102

2011-11-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E011443

2011-11-04 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 9545

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-10-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-09-05 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 9545

2011-08-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-07-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-07-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-07-06 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-06-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2362215 T3

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2011-05-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60336547

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60336547 P 20110512

2011-04-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-03-31 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DAS PRIORITAETSAKTENZEICHEN WURDE BERICHTIGT: AU 2002100801 / 27.02.2002

2011-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2011-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080506

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO