Global Patent Index - EP 1488269 A1

EP 1488269 A1 2004-12-22 - COMPACT FOUR-MIRROR ANASTIGMAT TELESCOPE

Title (en)

COMPACT FOUR-MIRROR ANASTIGMAT TELESCOPE

Title (de)

KOMPAKTES VIERSPIEGEL-ANASTIGMAT-TELESKOP

Title (fr)

TELESCOPE ANASTIGMAT COMPACT A QUATRE MIROIRS

Publication

EP 1488269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03745553 A

Priority

  • US 0308600 W
  • US 10442302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003179443A1] An optical system comprises a three-mirror anastigmat including a primary mirror, a secondary mirror, and a tertiary mirror positioned to reflect a beam path. An intermediate image is formed on the beam path at an intermediate-image location between the secondary mirror and the tertiary mirror. A negative-optical-power field mirror is positioned in the beam path at a field-mirror location subsequent to the intermediate-image location along the beam path. The field mirror reflects the intermediate image to the tertiary mirror.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 17/06 (2006.01); G02B 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 23/14 (2013.01); G02B 17/0657 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03083549A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2003179443 A1 20030925; US 6767103 B2 20040727; DE 60317643 D1 20080103; DE 60317643 T2 20081030; EP 1488269 A1 20041222; EP 1488269 B1 20071121; IL 161179 D0 20040831; WO 03083549 A1 20031009

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180306

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60317643 P 20080103

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR