Global Patent Index - EP 1488710 A2

EP 1488710 A2 2004-12-22 - A cigarette maker

Title (en)

A cigarette maker

Title (de)

Zigarettenherstellungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de fabrication de cigarettes

Publication

EP 1488710 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04425442 A

Priority

IT BO20030378 A

Abstract (en)

In a cigarette maker, shredded tobacco (9) is directed by a conveyor (23) into a riser (24) and ascends as a flow of distinct particles (38) toward an aspirating belt (25), placed at the top outlet end of the riser (24), by which the particles are attracted and gathered progressively to form a stream of tobacco filler. The riser (24) is made up of a lower first portion (26) in receipt of the tobacco (9) from the conveyor (23), and an upper second portion (27) enclosed by the aspirating belt (25); the first portion (26) is embodied separately from the second portion (27), and the two portions are interconnected by the revolving surface of a toothed suction roller (32) designed to transfer a uniform layer of tobacco (9) from the first portion to the second.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 1/02 (2006.01); A24C 5/18 (2006.01); A24C 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2013.01); A24C 5/1835 (2013.01); A24C 5/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1488710 A2 20041222; EP 1488710 A3 20060419; CN 1572157 A 20050202; IT BO20030378 A1 20041220; JP 2005006656 A 20050113; US 2004255964 A1 20041223

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071102

2006-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK