Global Patent Index - EP 1488867 A1

EP 1488867 A1 2004-12-22 - Mandrel for bending

Title (en)

Mandrel for bending

Title (de)

Biegedorn

Title (fr)

Mandrin à cintrer

Publication

EP 1488867 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04014189 A

Priority

JP 2003175101 A

Abstract (en)

A mandrel for bending of simple construction and sufficient rigidity is obtained. The mandrel comprises a plurality of plugs (12). Each plug is provided with a spherical outer peripheral surface. A fulcrum pin (16) is fitted through the plug. The first and second link members (18,20,22) are rotatably attached to the fulcrum pins of the neighboring plugs so as to connect the neighboring plugs. The plug is also provided with a spherical depression which the adjoining plug can enter during the bending. The plugs are connected to the shank (14) via the second link members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 9/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 2248683 A7 19750516 - IND MECCA BREV PEDRAZZOLI [IT]
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1488867 A1 20041222; JP 2005007438 A 20050113; US 2004255638 A1 20041223

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060523

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK