Global Patent Index - EP 1488925 A1

EP 1488925 A1 2004-12-22 - Cleaning device for a sheet printing machine and control device therefor

Title (en)

Cleaning device for a sheet printing machine and control device therefor

Title (de)

Bogendruckmaschinen-Wascheinrichtung und Steuereinrichtung dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage pour une machine d'impression de feuilles et son dispositif de contrôle

Publication

EP 1488925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04013759 A

Priority

DE 10327888 A

Abstract (en)

Control unit (112) for a sheet printer cleaning arrangement (16) is configured to generate positioning commands (AN1, AN2) to position the cleaning device relative to a rotating cylinder (10) segment (A, B) in different angular positions (W1, W4). Each angular position has a different adjustment approach angle (alpha , eta ) relative to a fixed angular position (C) of the cleaning arrangement. The invention also relates to a corresponding sheet printer washing or cleaning arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Bogendruckmaschinen-Reinigungseinrichtung (16,112) und Steuereinrichtung (112) dafür. Zur Anstellung einer Reinigungsvorrichtung (16) an einen zu reinigenden Zylinderumfangsabschnitt (A, B) eines rotierenden Druckzylinders (10) sind zwei Anstellbefehle (AN1, AN2) bei verschiedenen Wnkelstellen (W1, W4) vorgesehen, wobei jede Wnkelstelle (W1, W4) einen anderen Anstell-Vorlaufwinkel (α, ε) relativ zu einer ortsfesten Anstellwinkelposition (C) der Waschvorrichtung (16) hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/005 (2013.01); B41P 2235/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1488925 A1 20041222; EP 1488925 B1 20071212; DE 10327888 A1 20050105; DE 502004005674 D1 20080124

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180608

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130611

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005674 P 20080124

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2006-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK