Global Patent Index - EP 1489215 A2

EP 1489215 A2 2004-12-22 - Dyeing or bleaching apparatus for yarn packages

Title (en)

Dyeing or bleaching apparatus for yarn packages

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Färben oder Bleichen von Garnspulen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la teinture ou le blanchiment des bobines de fil textile

Publication

EP 1489215 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04076647 A

Priority

IT MI20031209 A

Abstract (en)

Dyeing or bleaching apparatus of yarns wound on reels or similar packages, comprising a plurality of small vertical dyeing boilers (15) arranged on a single circumference each suitable for receiving a mobile reel-holding shaft (13) able to be removed at the same time as the others for the subsequent centrifugal water-removal and drying operations, functioning in a reduced bath able to be impregnated even at fractional capacities with a constant bath ratio and productivity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489215 A2 20041222; EP 1489215 A3 20050921; BR PI0402218 A 20050125; CN 1572951 A 20050202; IT MI20031209 A1 20041217; IT MI20031209 D0 20030616; US 2004250575 A1 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1074064

2008-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070704

2007-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-06-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-10-28 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1074064

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK