Global Patent Index - EP 1489226 A2

EP 1489226 A2 2004-12-22 - Device for improving the properties of a fibrous web manufactured in a web former

Title (en)

Device for improving the properties of a fibrous web manufactured in a web former

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Eigenschaften einer in einer Blattbildungsvorrichtung hergestellten Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour améliorer les propriétés d'une bande de matériau fibreux fabriquée dans une section de formage

Publication

EP 1489226 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04102803 A

Priority

DE 10327424 A

Abstract (en)

A papermaking headbox discharges a fibrous suspension through a converging slit (1) with a first wide converging section (K) translating to a narrower section (5.1, 5.2) with parallel faces of constant height (Hs). The passage (2) has upper and lower sieve fibre guide inserts (3.1, 3.2) separate from the converging sidewalls (K) and subsequently translating to contact zones in the narrower section. The inserts are mirror-image panel units containing perforations, slits or other selected apertures.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Verbesserung der Eigenschaften einer in einer Blattbildungseinrichtung aus einer Faserstoffsuspension (2) hergestellten Faserstoffbahn (2.1), insbesondere einer Papier-, Karton- oder Tissuebahn, wobei die sich aus der Faserstoffsuspension (2) bildende Faserstoffbahn (2.1) mittels zweier Siebe (3, 3.1, 3.2) über eine Vielzahl von Elementen (4, 4.1, 4.2), insbesondere Siebführungs-, Formations- und/oder Entwässerungselementen, in Sieblaufrichtung (S) geführt ist. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass mindestens ein das Sieb (3, 3.1, 3.2) zumindest streckenweise berührendes Element (4, 4.1, 4.2) eine zum Sieb (3, 3.1, 3.2) hin gerichtete Profilkontur (K) aufweist, die sich vorzugsweise stetig konvergent dem Sieb (3, 3.1, 3.2) bis zur streckenweisen Berührung (5.1, 5.2) desselben bei einem konstanten Schichthöhenquerprofil (HS) senkrecht zur Sieblaufrichtung (S) im Bereich der streckenweisen Berührung (5.1, 5.2) annähert, um dadurch bessere Bahneigenschaften, insbesondere senkrecht zur Sieblaufrichtung (S), zu erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/48; D21F 1/52; D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/523 (2013.01); D21F 1/483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489226 A2 20041222; EP 1489226 A3 20050817; DE 10327424 A1 20050210

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071127

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070516

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21F 1/48 A

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21F 1/52 B

2005-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21F 9/00 B

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRABSCHEID,DR.JOACHIM

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOSER, JOHANN

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOLB, OTMAR

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT-ROHR, VOLKER

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JASCHINSKI, DR. THOMAS

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUF, WOLFGANG

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIRSBERGER, PETER

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCHHOLD, PHILIPP

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK