Global Patent Index - EP 1489306 A2

EP 1489306 A2 2004-12-22 - Pump

Title (en)

Pump

Title (de)

Pumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe

Publication

EP 1489306 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04014052 A

Priority

  • JP 2003172106 A
  • JP 2003290659 A
  • JP 2003348424 A
  • JP 2004084638 A

Abstract (en)

A pump (10) comprises a primary pump chamber (27) whose volume can be varied by driving a diaphragm (60), an inlet passage for allowing a working fluid to flow into the primary pump chamber (27), an outlet passage for allowing the working fluid to flow out of the primary pump chamber (27), and check valves (41, 42) for opening and closing at least the inlet passage, wherein the total inertance value of the inlet passage is set to be smaller than the total inertance value of the outlet passage, and bubble discharging means for discharging gas bubbles remaining in the primary pump chamber (27) is further provided. As a result, it is possible to provide a pump capable of discharging gas bubbles with the bubble discharging means and thus maintaining a discharging ability, even when the gas bubbles stay in the primary pump chamber (27). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 23/06 (2006.01); F04B 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/06 (2013.01); F04B 43/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489306 A2 20041222; EP 1489306 A3 20051116; EP 1489306 B1 20070606; CN 100398821 C 20080702; CN 1573102 A 20050202; DE 602004006802 D1 20070719; DE 602004006802 T2 20080214; JP 2005133704 A 20050526; JP 4678135 B2 20110427; US 2005019180 A1 20050127

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004006802 P 20070719

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK