Global Patent Index - EP 1489375 A1

EP 1489375 A1 2004-12-22 - Heat exchanger unit

Title (en)

Heat exchanger unit

Title (de)

Wärmetauscherblock

Title (fr)

Unité d'échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1489375 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04006316 A

Priority

DE 10322211 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanging block has heat exchangers (1-3) which are mutually connected by connectors. The connectors are arranged in the borings arranged in the projecting pieces on both gradings. Arrangement devices enable the arrangement of hoods (20) in the longitudinal walls of the collection containers. The gradings are provided to the narrow walls of the collection containers (4) of the heat exchangers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmetauscherblock, insbesondere für Off - Highway - Kraftfahrzeuge, bestehend aus mehreren Wärmetauschern (1; 2; 3) mit je zwei Sammelkästen (4; 5), die zwei Schmal - und zwei Längswände (6;16;7) besitzen, und mit zwischen den Sammelkästen (4; 5) angeordneten Flachrohren (10) und Wellrippen (11), wobei die Wärmetauscher (1, 2, 3) im Bereich der Schmalwände (6;16) ihrer Sammelkästen (4, 5) mittels Befestigungsorgan (8), das sich in übereinstimmenden Bohrungen (9) erstreckt, lösbar verbunden sind, gekennzeichnet durch die Kombination folgender Merkmale, wenigstens einige Sammelkästen (4; 5) sind Aluminiumgussteile; zumindest zwei unmittelbar korrespondierende Schmalwände (6) bzw. -seiten zweier Sammelkästen (4, 5) zweier Wärmetauscher besitzen eine Abstufung (13); die Abstufung (13) der Schmalseite (6) eines Sammelkastens (4) eines Wärmetauschers passt mit der Abstufung (13) an der Schmalseite (6) des benachbarten Sammelkastens (5) des anderen Wärmetauschers zusammen; die Bohrungen (9) sind in den vorspringenden Teilen (13a) beider Abstufungen (13) angebracht; in diesen Bohrungen (9) ist das Befestigungsorgan (8) angeordnet; in einer Längswand (7) der Sammelkästen wenigstens eines Wärmetauschers sind Mittel (70) zur Befestigung einer Ventilatorhaube (20) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/04; F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0443 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 2275/14 (2013.01); F28F 2275/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489375 A1 20041222; EP 1489375 B1 20091014; DE 10322211 A1 20041202; DE 502004010221 D1 20091126; US 2004250988 A1 20041216; US 8061410 B2 20111122

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100715

2009-11-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004010221 P 20091126

2009-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-10-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK