Global Patent Index - EP 1489564 A2

EP 1489564 A2 2004-12-22 - A method of delivering items from an item delivery system

Title (en)

A method of delivering items from an item delivery system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Auslieferung von Gegenständen aus einem Gegenstandsauslieferungssystem

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la livraison d'articles par un système de livraison d'articles

Publication

EP 1489564 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04075972 A

Priority

  • DK PA200000193 A
  • EP 01902287 A
  • US 18122900 P
  • US 21966100 P

Abstract (en)

A method for delivering items from a delivery system comprising a control unit, a delivery platform, at least two storage parts for storing items to be delivered to customers. The customer identifies himself, the control unit identifies an item to be delivered and the storage part containing the item. The item is then conveyed from the storage part to the delivery platform, the customer thereby receiving the item. The customer may be advised in advance, e.g. via a global computer network, that an item is to be delivered to him. Useful for delivering ordered items, such as mail order items, library books, etc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01); G07F 11/52 (2006.01); G07F 11/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07F 11/52 (2013.01); G07F 11/62 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489564 A2 20041222; EP 1489564 A3 20050119

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1299198 P

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR