Global Patent Index - EP 1489574 A2

EP 1489574 A2 2004-12-22 - Switch or signalling device for outputting utility signals

Title (en)

Switch or signalling device for outputting utility signals

Title (de)

Schalt- oder Meldegerät zur Ausgabe von Nutzsignalen

Title (fr)

Commutateur ou dispositif de signalisation pour la sortie de signaux d'utilité

Publication

EP 1489574 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04013849 A

Priority

  • DE 10326929 A
  • DE 10354570 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus includes a microprocessor for signal processing and at least one hardware and software specific interface such as a bus interface for transmitting and/or receiving digital signals or first alert signals. A non volatile memory stores user defined data or signals known as useful signals. A unit is provided for optical output and/or acoustic output of useful signals. At least one program interface is provided for communication between an external programmer and the microprocessor. A further interface is provided for receiving signals from a switch, an alarm device or a control device and with which executable functions or derivable states are associated. By means of the programmer each alert signal which can be transmitted via the interface to the apparatus has an associated useful signal stored in the memory. When an alert signal is received the associated useful signal is output or can be called up later.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schalt- und/oder Meldegerät (100) welches umfasst: einen Mikroprozessor (µP); mindestens eine hardware- und softwaremäßig ausgebildete Schnittstelle (BS, DS), insbesondere eine Busschnittstelle zum Senden und/oder Empfangen von digitalen Signalen (BE) (erste "Meldesignale" (BE); eine, vorzugsweise nicht flüchtige Speichereinheit (S) für die Speicherung benutzerdefinierter Daten oder Signale (SE1 ... SE10) (im folgenden "Nutzsignale" genannt); eine Einheit für die optische Ausgabe (OS) und/oder die akustische Ausgabe (NS) von Nutzsignalen (SE1 ... SE10); mindestens eine Programmierschnittstelle (PS) zur Kommunikation zwischen einer externen Programmiereinheit (PC) und dem Mikroprozessor (µP); mindestens eine hardware- und softwaremäßig ausgebildete Schnittstelle (BS, DS) (im folgenden "Signalschnittstelle") für den Empfang von Signalen, die gemeldet werden von einem Schalter, einem Meldegerät, oder einem Gerät der Steuerungstechnik und jeweils ausführbaren Funktionen und oder einnehmbaren Zustände zugeordnet sind (zweite "Meldesignale" ME1 ... ME8); wobei mit der Programmiereinheit (PC) jedem über die Signalschnittstelle dem Gerät übermittelbaren Meldesignale (BE, ME1 ... ME8) ein in der Speichereinheit (S) gespeichertes Nutzsignal (SE1 ... SE10) zuordbar sind und wobei bei Eintreffen eines Meldesignals (BE, ME1 ... ME8) die Ausgabe des zugeordneten Nutzsignals erfolgt oder das zugeordnete Nutzsignal später abrufbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/14; G08B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/06 (2006.01); G08B 25/01 (2006.01); G08B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/012 (2013.01); G08B 7/06 (2013.01); G08B 25/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1489574 A2 20041222; EP 1489574 A3 20060118

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK