Global Patent Index - EP 1490102 A1

EP 1490102 A1 2004-12-29 - FUEL ADDITIVE

Title (en)

FUEL ADDITIVE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFZUSATZ

Title (fr)

ADDITIF DE COMBUSTIBLE

Publication

EP 1490102 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03706789 A

Priority

  • IB 0300787 W
  • ZA 200201965 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03075954A1] An emulsifying composition which includes an ethoxylated alkylphenol, a fatty acid amide, naphtha and oleic acid. The composition is used for emulsifying fuel and water mixtures in internal combustion engines, open flame burners (boilers) or the like. Preferably the composition includes one part polyoxyethylene -nonylphenol, two parts coconut diethanolamide, two parts heavy naphtha and one part oleic acid, by volume. The invention also extends to a hydrocarbon fuel including a composition in accordance with the invention and to a method of forming a hydrocarbon fuel and water emulsion including the composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/04; A61K 39/39; A61P 31/06; A61P 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/32 (2006.01); A61K 39/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 31/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); B01F 17/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/10 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/02 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 1/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/10 (2013.01); B01F 17/0085 (2013.01); C10L 1/328 (2013.01); C10L 10/02 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 10/06 (2013.01); C10L 1/125 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03075954A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03075954 A1 20030918; AU 2003208499 A1 20030922; CA 2518586 A1 20030918; CN 1297636 C 20070131; CN 1652818 A 20050810; EP 1490102 A1 20041229; JP 2005530862 A 20051013; US 2005223628 A1 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072549

2008-04-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/32 20060101AFI20070206BHEP

2005-09-02 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072549

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO