Global Patent Index - EP 1490653 A1

EP 1490653 A1 2004-12-29 - HAND-HELD LASER DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND ACCESSORY

Title (en)

HAND-HELD LASER DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND ACCESSORY

Title (de)

HANDGEHALTENES LASERENTFERNUNGSMESSGERÄT UND ZUBEHÖRTEIL

Title (fr)

TÉLÉMÈTRE LASER TENU À LA MAIN ET ACCESSOIRE

Publication

EP 1490653 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03708004 A

Priority

  • DE 0300187 W
  • DE 10213434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03081173A1] The invention relates to a device (10), particularly a laser range finding device, comprising a first mount for detachably fastening a first accessory (18). According to the invention, the first mount has at least one detent element (22.1) that, when the first accessory (18, 20) is mounted, engages with the first accessory (18, 20). The invention also relates to a corresponding accessory (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01C 3/08; G01D 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 3/06 (2006.01); G01C 3/08 (2006.01); G01C 9/34 (2006.01); G01C 15/00 (2006.01); G01D 11/24 (2006.01); G01S 7/48 (2006.01); G01S 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 11/24 (2013.01); G01S 7/4813 (2013.01); G01S 17/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03081173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 03081173 A1 20031002; CN 1610818 A 20050427; CN 1610818 B 20111207; DE 10213434 A1 20031023; EP 1490653 A1 20041229; JP 2005521044 A 20050714; JP 4546737 B2 20100915; US 2004239914 A1 20041202; US 7259837 B2 20070821

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170810

2017-04-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170330

2017-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 15/00 20060101ALI20170315BHEP

2017-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 11/24 20060101ALN20170315BHEP

2017-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 9/34 20060101ALN20170315BHEP

2017-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 3/08 20060101AFI20170315BHEP

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 15/00 20060101ALI20170309BHEP

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 11/24 20060101ALN20170309BHEP

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 3/08 20060101AFI20170309BHEP

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 9/34 20060101ALN20170309BHEP

2010-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100921

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR