Global Patent Index - EP 1491129 A1

EP 1491129 A1 2004-12-29 - Method and apparatus for producing a mixture of steam and cleaning solution

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for producing a mixture of steam and cleaning solution

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines Gemisches aus Wasserdampf und Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la production d' un mélange de vapeur et produit de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1491129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03405472 A

Priority

EP 03405472 A

Abstract (en)

Water (1), preferably de-mineralized and de-calcified, is guided under pressure from a tank (2) to a spray diffuser (3). The spray is heated in a suitable device (4) and the resulting steam mixed with a cleansing fluid (5) also guided under pressure from a tank (41) into the mixing unit. The cleansing fluid can be pre-heated for a better result and supplied constantly or intermittently. The mixture is guided through a flexible pipe (48) to the outlet located at a floor cleaning tool (11) or a similar device. An independent claim is also included for a device for creating a mixture of steam and cleansing fluid.

Abstract (de)

Zum Erzeugen eines Gemisches aus Wasserdampf und Reinigungsmittel wird Wasser (1) aus einem Wassertank (2) unter Druck einer Zerstäuberdüse (3) zugeführt und zerstäubt. Das zerstäubte Wasser wird in einem brennergeheizten Dampfkessel (4) verdampft. Anschliessend wird ein flüssiges Reinigungsmittel (5) ebenfalls unter Druck in den vom Dampfkessel abgeführten Dampf (6) eingespeist. Auf diese Weise entsteht ein Gemisch (47), das einem Verbrauchen (11) wie z.B. einer Bodenreinigungsmaschine (55), einer Reinigungslanze (58) oder einem anderen Gerät zugeführt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/34; B08B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 3/20 (2006.01); B08B 3/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); F22B 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2013.01); B01F 3/0865 (2013.01); B01F 3/088 (2013.01); B01F 3/20 (2013.01); B01F 3/2078 (2013.01); B08B 3/026 (2013.01); C11D 11/0017 (2013.01); F22B 27/16 (2013.01); B08B 2230/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491129 A1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070317

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050205

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK